MD HB123 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an employer, on request, to provide to an applicant for employment the wage range for the position for which the applicant applied; prohibiting an employer from taking negative actions against an applicant for employment because the applicant did not provide wage history or a wage range; prohibiting an employer from relying on wage history, except when voluntarily provided, for the purpose of determining fair wage, and from seeking an applicant's wage history from former employers or their agents; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Wage History and Wage Range

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 67
2020-03-16HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (31-14)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-13SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (98-36)
2020-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseMotion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {723993/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-15HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB217 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment3101(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment3304.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment3308(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback