MD HB1204 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a county board, public or nonpublic prekindergarten programs, and public or nonpublic primary or secondary schools that receive State funds from discriminating against a person because of certain factors, refusing enrollment of, expelling, or withholding privileges from any student or prospective student because of certain factors, from taking a certain retaliatory action; providing certain penalties; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools – Discrimination – Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (95-38)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-11HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {395467/1 Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB993 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education2303(n/a)See Bill Text
Education26701(n/a)See Bill Text
Education26702(n/a)See Bill Text
Education26703(n/a)See Bill Text
Education26704(n/a)See Bill Text
Education26705(n/a)See Bill Text
Education4108(n/a)See Bill Text
Education71A-04(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback