MD HB1204 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a county board, public or nonpublic prekindergarten programs, and public or nonpublic primary or secondary schools that receive State funds from discriminating against a person because of certain factors, refusing enrollment of, expelling, or withholding privileges from any student or prospective student because of certain factors, from taking a certain retaliatory action; providing certain penalties; etc.
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools – Discrimination – Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-38) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {395467/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB993 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Counties
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Gender
Hearings
Human Relations
Marriage
Mediation
Minorities
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Officials
Religion
Rules and Regulations
Students
Counties
Disabilities
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Gender
Hearings
Human Relations
Marriage
Mediation
Minorities
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Officials
Religion
Rules and Regulations
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |