MD HB1204 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the County Council of Dorchester County to impose a tax on the privilege of engaging in the transmission of electricity in the county using specified long distance, extra-high voltage electric transmission lines; providing that the tax is the product of multiplying the miles of specified electric transmission lines and a base rate and the voltage carrying capacity of specified electric transmission lines; authorizing the county council to set the base rate; providing for the use of the net proceeds of the tax; etc.
Title
Dorchester County - Electric Transmission Privilege Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn | |
2011-03-04 | Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means) | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Ways and Means & Economic Matters | |
2011-02-17 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Conservation
County Councils
Dorchester County
Energy Matters
High Voltage Lines
Laws and Ordinances
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Tourism
Utilities
Conservation
County Councils
Dorchester County
Energy Matters
High Voltage Lines
Laws and Ordinances
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Tourism
Utilities
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1204.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1204f.pdf |