MD HB12 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-05 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-05 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making it a misdemeanor to knowingly and willfully shine, point, or focus the beam of a laser pointer on an individual operating an aircraft; exempting specified individuals under specified circumstances from provisions of the Act; specifying a penalty; and specifying that a sentence imposed under the Act is in addition to a specified other sentence.
Title
Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft
Sponsors
Del. Sam Arora [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {978378/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2013-02-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-11 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2012-09-04 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Aircraft
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Fines
Nuisances
Penalties and Sentences
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Fines
Nuisances
Penalties and Sentences