MD HB1186 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Howard County to grant a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on residential or commercial real property that has suffered damage caused by a natural disaster; and making certain alterations to the county's existing authority to provide a property tax credit for commercial property that has suffered damage caused by flood conditions.
Title
Howard County - Property Tax Credit - Natural Disaster Ho. Co. 09-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141 |
2018-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |