MD HB1182 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Approving specified projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of specified academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; authorizing the University System of Maryland to issue bonds in a total principal amount of $37,500,000 to finance and refinance specified renewal projects; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator DeGrange) Adopted |
2015-04-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2015-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-30 | House | Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Jones) Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {274265/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-02-23 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Bonds
Capital Budget
Prince George's County
Security Deposits
State Universities and Colleges
Wicomico County
Capital Budget
Prince George's County
Security Deposits
State Universities and Colleges
Wicomico County