MD HB118 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB721

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting an individual from causing the serious physical injury or death of a certain vulnerable individual as a result of the individual operating a vehicle in violation of Maryland Vehicle Law; defining "vulnerable individual" as a person acting lawfully including a pedestrian, certain workers and emergency services personnel, an individual walking an animal, or an individual operating certain modes of transport; establishing certain penalties of a fine of up to $2,000, community service, motor vehicle safety education; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 165
2021-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2021-04-08HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {638371/1 Adopted
2021-03-31SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-12SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-11HouseThird Reading Passed (133-2)
2021-02-08HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-04HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-07-13HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB293 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
HB721 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation11145(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation21901.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback