MD HB1179 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the commissions from 5.5% to 6% that certain licensed agents receive from certain lottery ticket sales and that certain veterans organizations receive from sales of tickets from instant ticket lottery machines.
Title
State Lottery - Sales of Lottery Tickets and Tickets From Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Commissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Recede |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2022-04-11 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {523721/1 Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-1) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {333823/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2022-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 913 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |