MD HB1174 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a provision of law relating to the revocation of a parole order so as to authorize the parole commissioner who conducted the hearing on the revocation of an inmate's order of parole to reimpose any unserved portion of the sentence originally imposed on the inmate; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to submit a specified report; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2014.
Title
Correctional Services - Revocation of Parole - Reimposition of Sentence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-4) | |
2011-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-25 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (94-45) | |
2011-04-08 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (83-56) | |
2011-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-10 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2011-03-07 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2011-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Sunset