MD HB1173 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a landlord who offers a dwelling unit for rent in the State under a rent-to-own agreement on or after October 1, 2017, to use a written lease; prohibiting a landlord from entering into or offering to enter into a rent-to-own agreement with a tenant except under specified circumstances; requiring a specified landlord to deliver a copy of a specified attorney certification to a prospective tenant together with a rent-to-own contract; etc.
Title
Real Property - Rent-to-Own Agreements and Contracts - Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
Subjects
Attorney General
Attorneys
Bonds
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Unfair Trade Practices
Attorneys
Bonds
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Unfair Trade Practices