MD HB1170 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from selling or issuing a prepaid international calling card that is subject to expiration unless the date on which the prepaid international calling card expires is disclosed in a specified manner; and providing that a violation of the Act is an unfair or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act and is subject to enforcement and penalty provisions.
Title
Consumer Protection - Prepaid International Calling Cards - Notice of
Sponsors
Del. Saqib Ali [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
International Affairs
Penalties and Sentences
Telephones
Unfair Trade Practices
Disclosure
International Affairs
Penalties and Sentences
Telephones
Unfair Trade Practices
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB1170.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb1170f.pdf |