MD HB1169 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a waiver from minimum school funding requirements for schools with fewer than 300 students.
Title
Education - Minimum School Funding - Waiver
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-29 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB856 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Revenue and Taxes
Students
Waivers
Weights and Measures
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Revenue and Taxes
Students
Waivers
Weights and Measures