MD HB1150 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain highway maintenance and service equipment and vehicles, while in use for snow removal or the protection of highway maintenance workers, to be equipped with and display green flashing lights simultaneously with yellow or amber flashing lights.
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB579 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Highways
Jurisdiction
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Safety
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Jurisdiction
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Safety
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 22 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 22 | 218.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |