MD HB1144 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 783
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Central Payroll Bureau of the Office of the State Comptroller to establish regular pay periods and pay each employee at least once every 2 weeks or twice a month; requiring each appointing authority to calculate and report specified payroll information to the Central Payroll Bureau; requiring an employee or their exclusive representative to initiate a specified grievance procedure under specified circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payroll Recovery Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-48) (Y: 87 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-11) (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {703420/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-29) (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {163726/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {203721/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-31) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {453326/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-32) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {853327/2 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28) (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {103820/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {973429/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {373620/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-48) (Y: 91 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {793129/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (49-87) (Y: 49 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {133725/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-86) (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {313623/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (50-85) (Y: 50 N: 85 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {963223/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (50-86) (Y: 50 N: 86 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 783
2017-04-10HousePassed Enrolled
2017-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (87-48)
2017-04-10HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (33-11)
2017-04-10SenateFloor Amendment {703420/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-29)
2017-04-10SenateFloor Amendment {163726/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-31)
2017-04-10SenateFloor Amendment {203721/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-31)
2017-04-10SenateFloor Amendment {453326/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-32)
2017-04-10SenateFloor Amendment {853327/2 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)
2017-04-10SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Miller) Adopted
2017-04-10SenateFloor Amendment {103820/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (15-30)
2017-04-10SenateFloor Amendment {973429/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-31)
2017-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-07SenateFloor Amendment {373620/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (15-30)
2017-04-07SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Brochin) Adopted
2017-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {787777/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2017-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (91-48)
2017-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-18HouseFloor Amendment {793129/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (49-87)
2017-03-18HouseFloor Amendment {133725/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-86)
2017-03-18HouseFloor Amendment {313623/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (50-85)
2017-03-18HouseFloor Amendment {963223/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (50-86)
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {584568/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2017-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1144&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1144f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1144t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1144e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_783_hb1144e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_13372501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_31362301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_58456801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_79312901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_96322301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_37362001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_78777701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_10382001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_16372601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_20372101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_45332601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_70342001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_85332702.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_97342901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb1144.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1144_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1144_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,h-0669&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,h-0670&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,h-0671&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,h-0672&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,h-0833&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,s-1256&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,h-1575&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,s-1306&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,s-1307&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,s-1508&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,s-1509&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,s-1510&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,s-1511&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,s-1512&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1144,s-1513&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback