MD HB1143 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "affected employee" for purposes of certain provisions of unemployment insurance law governing work sharing to include certain individuals who were rehired, subject to a certain limitation, by an affected unit following a temporary closure or layoff due to the COVID-19 pandemic; requiring the Department to ensure that the work sharing unemployment insurance program has sufficient staff and resources to complete the processing of complete applications within 10 days after receipt; etc.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing (Work Share Expansion Act of 2021)
Sponsors
Del. Ned Carey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 54 |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-2) |
2021-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {663490/1 Adopted |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB771 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 64
Subjects
Apprentices
Claims
COVID-19
Emergency Bills
Federal Aid
Federal Government
Insurance
Labor, Department of
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor, and Employment
Claims
COVID-19
Emergency Bills
Federal Aid
Federal Government
Insurance
Labor, Department of
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 8 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 1202.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 1204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |