MD HB1143 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting specified transactions of retail jewelers from the requirement to hold a secondhand precious metal object dealer license; requiring specified items to remain tagged for the entire period the item is stored in the dealer's inventory; requiring the primary law enforcement unit to adopt procedures for dealers to amend submitted records; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers - Exempted
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-18 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-18 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-07 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2011-02-14 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |