MD HB1125 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an approving body to require a redevelopment project design to reduce existing impervious area within the limit of disturbance by at least 50% as determined by the 2000 Maryland Stormwater Design Manual, Volumes I and II; implementing environmental site design to the maximum extent practicable to provide water quality treatment for at least 50% of the existing impervious area within the limit of disturbance, as determined by specified sources; or using a combination of specified stormwater strategies; etc.
Title
Stormwater Management - Development Projects - Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Del. Galen Clagett [D] |
Del. D Page Elmore [R] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Sen. Mary James [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-04-01 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (127-13) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-18 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-25 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-25 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Construction
Counties
Environmental Matters
Fees
Flood Control
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Zoning and Planning
Counties
Environmental Matters
Fees
Flood Control
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Zoning and Planning