MD HB1123 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the name of the Industrial Hemp Pilot Program to be the Hemp Research Pilot Program; establishing the Hemp Farming Program to promote hemp as an agricultural commodity in the State, the commercial sale of hemp products within and outside the State and to facilitate the research of hemp and hemp products; requiring the Department of Agriculture, in consultation with the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission, to adopt regulations to protect hemp growers and medical cannabis growers from the risk of cross-pollination; etc.
Title
Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production
Sponsors
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] | Del. Andrew Cassilly [R] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] |
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. Dana Stein [D] | Del. William Wivell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228 |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {644730/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {730314/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Advertising
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Attorney General
Cannabis
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Farmland
Federal Government
Fees
Fraud
Governor
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Interest
Interstate Affairs
Investments
Laboratories
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Negligence
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Records
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Treasurers
Zoning and Planning
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Attorney General
Cannabis
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Farmland
Federal Government
Fees
Fraud
Governor
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Interest
Interstate Affairs
Investments
Laboratories
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Negligence
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Records
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Treasurers
Zoning and Planning