MD HB1121 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Sexual Assault Evidence Kit Policy and Funding Committee to develop a process to allow the victim of a sexual assault to elect to pay for the testing of a sexual assault evidence kit.
Title
Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Voluntary Payment by Victim for Testing of Kit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |