MD HB1114 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Charles County to set a special property tax rate that is 12.5% greater than the tax rate that is generally applicable to real property for a class of real property that is defined as blighted by local law; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022.
Title
Charles County - Blighted Property - Special Property Tax Rate
Sponsors
Del. Debra Davis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB741 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 6 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1114?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb1114f.pdf |