MD HB1101 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for a State correctional officer for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than 75 weeks; and providing that the Act applies only prospectively and may not be applied or interpreted to have any effect on or application to any claims arising before October 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2017-03-03HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback