MD HB1101 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that specified closed swimming lakes located within and maintained by a municipal corporation and only accessible to residents of the municipal corporation are not subject to specified State or county regulations; requiring that a municipal corporation that maintains a closed swimming lake establish a policy to assess and monitor the water quality of the closed swimming lake.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Corporations - Closed Swimming Lake - Regulation MC 32-16

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-12HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 131
2016-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2016-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2016-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2016-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {800115/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2016-03-11HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-11HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1101&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1101f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1101t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_131_hb1101t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0001/hb1101_80011501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb1101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1101_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1101_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1101,h-0607&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1101,s-0945&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback