MD HB1098 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-10 - Special Order later today (Senator McFadden) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-10 - Special Order later today (Senator McFadden) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring binding arbitration between specified employee organizations representing specified Baltimore City police officers and the City of Baltimore under specified circumstances; applying specified procedures governing binding arbitration for firefighters and fire officers to specified police officers; authorizing a specified party to request arbitration under specified circumstances; providing for the selection of a specified board of arbitration; requiring a specified board of arbitration to consider specified matters; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Binding Arbitration - Police Officers
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Peter Hammen [D] |
Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Del. Brian McHale [D] | Del. Maggie McIntosh [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Special Order later today (Senator McFadden) Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (110-30) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Arbitration
Baltimore City
Collective Bargaining
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Salaries
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Baltimore City
Collective Bargaining
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Salaries
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment