MD HB1096 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a sexual assault evidence collection kit be submitted to a forensic laboratory for analysis unless a certain requirement is met; requiring that a victim who wishes to remain anonymous and not file a criminal complaint be informed that the victim may initiate a criminal complaint at a future time; requiring a certain law enforcement agency that receives a sexual assault evidence collection kit and all requested associated reference standards to submit the kit for forensic analysis within 30 days of receipt of the kit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {692311/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback