MD HB109 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Community Development Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; establishing the Community Development Board in the Department; establishing the Community Development Fund to provide financial assistance to community development projects and community development organizations around the State; requiring the Board to report on the activities of the Fund to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31 each year; providing for the construction of the Act; etc.
Title
Community Development Program Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-5) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-48) (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {483622/1 (Delegate McDonough) Rejected (48-86) (Y: 49 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-48) (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {483622/1 (Delegate McDonough) Rejected (48-86) (Y: 49 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801 |
2018-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-5) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-48) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Floor Amendment {483622/1 (Delegate McDonough) Rejected (48-86) |
2018-03-06 | House | Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {690714/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Economic and Community Development
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Economic and Community Development
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business