MD HB1088 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the owner of a returnable container or returnable textile to bring a specified civil action and to recover a specified amount in damages and attorney's fees; increasing specified penalties and fines for specified violations of law; and repealing a provision of law relating to the application for an arrest warrant for specified persons under specified circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Regulation - Returnable Containers and Returnable Textiles - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-09HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146
2013-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2013-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2013-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-21SenateFirst Reading Finance
2013-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2013-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-03-19HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-03-19HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2013-03-12HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback