MD HB1081 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Baltimore City to tow vehicles blocking access to driveways, alleys, transit lanes, or parking facilities.
Title
Baltimore City – Vehicle Laws – Towing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-21 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB750 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 585