MD HB1079 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing local jurisdictions to regulate the crossing by pedestrians of roadways between adjacent intersections at which traffic control signals are not in operation; and establishing a specified civil penalty for a violation.
Title
Roadways - Crossing by Pedestrians of Roadways - Authority of Local Jurisdictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (86-53) (Y: 86 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (86-53) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {910211/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |