MD HB1059 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an insurer to rescind a policy or binder of personal automobile insurance if the applicant's initial premium payment is made by a check or other remittance that is not honored on presentation to a specified financial institution; requiring an insurer to continue or reinstate a policy under specified circumstances; requiring that an insurer, to rescind the policy or binder, send a specified notice to specified persons within a specified period of time in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Personal Automobile Insurance - Rescission of Policy or Binder - Authorized
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 837971/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-04-01 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (125-5) | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments 973391/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-14 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Checks
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Disclosure
Insurance
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Notices
Postal Service
Prices
Real Property
Security Interests
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Disclosure
Insurance
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Notices
Postal Service
Prices
Real Property
Security Interests