MD HB1056 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law that requires specified licensed realtors to complete fewer overall clock hours of continuing education instruction than are generally required during specified licensing periods; requiring that specified mandated subject matter for continuing education courses be taken by a licensee during each licensing period; etc.
Title
Real Estate Brokers and Salespersons - Continuing Education - Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Michael Vaughn [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D] | Del. Warren Miller [R] |
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-2) |
2015-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |