MD HB1047 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a party in a criminal trial involving an allegation of sexually assaultive behavior may not introduce information that physical evidence of sexually assaultive behavior was obtained using certain materials; providing that selling, offering for sale, or distributing a certain self-administered sexual assault evidence collection kit is an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice; establishing the Forensic Nurse Examiner Training Grant Program and the Forensic Nurse Examiner Training Grant Program Fund; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection – Self–Administered Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits
Sponsors
Del. Sandy Bartlett [D] | Del. Lauren Arikan [R] | Del. Karen Simpson [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] |
Del. Nicole Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-2) |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment {723327/1 (Senator King) Adopted |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {563124/1 Adopted |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {403621/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB949 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedures
Damages
Emergency Bills
Evidence
Examinations
Fines
Forms
Grants
Health Occupations
Hearings
Higher Education
Job Training
Medical Examiners
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Trials
Unfair Trade Practices
Victims
Vulnerable Adults
Waivers
Warranties
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedures
Damages
Emergency Bills
Evidence
Examinations
Fines
Forms
Grants
Health Occupations
Hearings
Higher Education
Job Training
Medical Examiners
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Trials
Unfair Trade Practices
Victims
Vulnerable Adults
Waivers
Warranties
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 925 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 926 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |