MD HB1042 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting on or after June 1, 2010, specified courts, the Maryland General Assembly, and specified departments and specified units of the Executive Branch of State government from publicly posting or displaying on specified Internet websites an individual's personal information under specified circumstances; authorizing specified persons to request that specified official custodians mask specified personal information in the Internet version of specified records; etc.
Title
State Government - Disclosure of Personal Information on Websites - Prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. John Donoghue [D] | Del. Donald Elliott [R] |
Del. Peter Hammen [D] | Del. Stephen Lafferty [D] | Del. Shane Pendergrass [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Frosh) Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-08 | Floor Amendment (Senator Haines) Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-04-08 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-15 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Archives
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Deeds
Disclosure
District Courts
Drivers` Licenses
Electronic Government
General Assembly
Liability
Notices
Orphans` Court
Privacy
Public Information
Publications
Recordation
Records
Social Security
Tax Court, Maryland
Archives
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Deeds
Disclosure
District Courts
Drivers` Licenses
Electronic Government
General Assembly
Liability
Notices
Orphans` Court
Privacy
Public Information
Publications
Recordation
Records
Social Security
Tax Court, Maryland