MD HB1040 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each local school system, beginning in the 2016-1017 school year, to include on specified information on student report cards; requiring specified information to be presented in a specified manner; requiring the State Department of Education to develop a specified system of grading public schools in the State based on specified performance levels of a specified State assessment; requiring the Department to make a specified notification before the start of a specified school year; etc.
Title
Education - Student Report Cards - Required Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Education
Education, State Department of
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Rules and Regulations
Education
Education, State Department of
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Rules and Regulations