MD HB1039 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering penalties for the crime of human trafficking; decriminalizing prostitution committed by a minor; repealing a certain requirement that a certain individual be charged with violating a certain provision of law before a defendant may raise a certain affirmative defense; requiring a certain person to provide certain referral services to a certain minor under certain circumstances; and classifying human trafficking as a crime of violence under a certain provision of law.
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Penalties (Human Trafficking Reform Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2019-02-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Human Trafficking
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
State's Attorneys
Violence
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Human Trafficking
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
State's Attorneys
Violence