MD HB1039 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering distributions from the Purse Dedication Account for horse racing licensees; altering the conditions under which a specified licensee is required to take specified actions in connection with the Bowie Training Center; providing the State with the right of first refusal when a specified training center is no longer required to operate as a specified training center; providing the City of Bowie with the right of second refusal when a specified training center is no longer required to operate as a specified training center; etc.
Title
Horse Racing - Distribution of Video Lottery Revenues
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Brochin) {973926/1 Rejected (Y: 6 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Brochin) {973926/1 Rejected (Y: 6 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (40-5) | |
2011-04-08 | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-08 | Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) Rejected (6-33) | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation & Finance | |
2011-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (106-28) | |
2011-04-09 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (94-39) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Arbitration
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Construction
Gaming
Governor
Grants
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Policy Committee
Licenses
Mediation
Municipal Corporations
Program Open Space
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Racing
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Construction
Gaming
Governor
Grants
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Policy Committee
Licenses
Mediation
Municipal Corporations
Program Open Space
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Racing
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment