MD HB1021 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB902
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 106 to 120 days, the period during which an employer is not required to allow an employee to use earned sick and safe leave; altering the circumstances under which an employer is required to reinstate certain unused sick and safe leave; and altering the circumstances under which an employer is authorized to require an employee who uses earned sick and safe leave to provide certain verification.
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Temporary Workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB1021 (Carry Over) 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
SB906 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
SB906 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |