MD HB1018 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting a holder of a Class 4 limited winery license from a certain restriction on interactions with retailers in Charles County; and authorizing a holder of a Class 4 limited winery license to have a financial interest in a certain other license in Charles County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543
2021-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-08SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-18SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2021-03-12HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-05HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2021-02-05HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB833 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages18102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages18401(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages18403(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages2216(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback