MD HB1003 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor or the head of a certain unit to provide written notice to the Legislative Policy Committee within 72 hours after the earlier of the execution of the contract or the expenditure of funds when authorizing an emergency procurement during a state of emergency under certain circumstances; requiring the Governor or the head of a certain unit to provide a copy of a certain procurement contract to the Legislative Policy Committee; authorizing the Legislative Policy Committee to request a certain audit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

States of Emergency - Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments - Notice and Authorization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-04-07SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-04-05SenateReferred Rules
2021-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (131-1)
2021-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {334560/1 Adopted
2021-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-02-06HouseHearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB780 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-09 - Third Reading Passed (127-9)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety14117(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement7214(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback