MD SB780 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor or the head of a certain unit to provide certain notice to the Legislative Policy Committee within 72 hours after the earlier of the execution of the contract or the expenditure of the funds when authorizing a certain emergency procurement during a state of emergency under certain circumstances; requiring the Governor or the head of a certain unit to provide a copy of a certain procurement contract to the Committee under certain circumstances; authorizing the Committee to request a certain audit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

States of Emergency – Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments – Notice and Authorization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (129-7)
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {824461/1 Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-03-29HouseHearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
2021-03-29HouseHearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2021-03-19HouseReferred Appropriations Health and Government Operations
2021-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {934733/1 Adopted
2021-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-12SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2021-02-05SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB1003 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety14117(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement7214(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0780?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0780f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0780t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0780e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0780_93473301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0780_82446101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0780_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0780_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0780_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0526.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1300.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1245.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback