MD HB1000 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a guardian of the property of a minor or disabled person from distributing or disbursing property of the minor or disabled person without court authorization or confirmation if the guardian is not a family member of the minor or disabled person under certain circumstances; providing that, if a guardian of the property violates the Act, the guardian is liable for breach of the guardian's fiduciary duty to certain persons to the same extent as a trustee of an express trust; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardian of Property of Minor or Disabled Person - Prohibition on Distribution or Disbursement
Sponsors
Del. Jesse Pippy [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Damages
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Ethics
Liability
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Personal Property
Vulnerable Adults
Damages
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Ethics
Liability
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Personal Property
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |