MA S982 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to parental choice of terminology in certain domestic relations matters. The Judiciary.
Title
Relating to parental choice of terminology in certain domestic relations matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S982 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S982.pdf |