MA S967 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide a lifeline medical amnesty for persons under age 21. The Judiciary.
Title
To provide a lifeline medical amnesty for persons under age 21
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S159 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S111 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S60 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S607 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S62 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Accompanied H4664
H348 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2223 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H338 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2468 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1967 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1190 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4664
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S111 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S60 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S607 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S62 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Accompanied H4664
H348 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2223 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H338 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2468 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1967 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1190 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4664
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S967 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S967.pdf |