MA S111 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide immunity for individuals under age 21 seeking medical assistance for an alcohol-related overdose. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Providing immunity for individuals under age 21 seeking medical assistance for an alcohol-related overdose
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-09-08 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-08-29 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 428 |
2017-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S159 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S150 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S901 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2468 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2310 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1190 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4664
H942 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S150 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S901 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2468 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2310 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1190 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4664
H942 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S111 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S111.pdf |