MA S959 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to habitual drunk drivers. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to habitual drunk drivers
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1310 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S785 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1913 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S2005 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
S830 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2168 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2178
S2099 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - New draft substituted, see S2168
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S785 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1913 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S2005 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
S830 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2168 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2178
S2099 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - New draft substituted, see S2168
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S959 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S959.pdf |