MA S2099 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1913
Note: Legislation replaced by S2168
Note: Legislation replaced by S2168
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-12 - New draft substituted, see S2168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-12 - New draft substituted, see S2168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to handicapped parking,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2099)
Title
Relative to handicapped parking
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2168 |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Postponed until next session |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Read second |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, October 4, 2017 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2168 |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-06-29 | Senate | New draft of S1913 |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1913 (Replaces) 2017-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S830 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S765 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S959 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S785 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H561 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H939 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2168 (Replaced by) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2178
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S830 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S765 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S959 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S785 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H561 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H939 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2168 (Replaced by) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2178
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2099 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2099.pdf |