MA S958 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to approve subdivision bonds by the planning board. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to subdivision bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-04-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-04-15 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S958 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S958.pdf |