MA S95 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to Foster Kids. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to foster kids
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S845 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S892 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S793 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S63 (Similar To) 2015-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S847 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
S785 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H1349 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1622 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S892 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S793 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S63 (Similar To) 2015-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S847 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
S785 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H1349 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1622 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S95 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S95.pdf |