MA H1349 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to civil rights actions. The Judiciary.
Title
Amending the statute of limitations in civil rights actions
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
Rep. David Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2747 (Similar To) 2016-04-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2016
H3007 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H386 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
H2747 (Similar To) 2016-04-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2016
H3007 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H386 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1349 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1349.pdf |