MA S947 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4672
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure legal parentage equality. The Judiciary.
Title
To ensure legal parentage equality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4672 |
2024-05-22 | House | House concurred |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-16 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4672 (Replaced by) 2024-06-12 - Published as amended, see H4750
H4750 (Similar To) 2024-08-01 - Reported by H4970
H4970 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2024
H4750 (Similar To) 2024-08-01 - Reported by H4970
H4970 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S947 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S947.pdf |